Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006221652 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060106877 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006288194 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1717940 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1848636 | 18.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2884075 | 06.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200637117 | 16.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0550873 | 04.04.2005 |