EP1708104 - Crawling databases for information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kapadia, Arshish C. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Crow, Howard M. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
Burke, Jonah S. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
Parke, Robert D. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06111548.1 | 22.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | US20050096429 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 96429 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708104 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F17/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | Websuche in Datenbanken nach Informationen | [2006/40] | English: | Crawling databases for information | [2006/40] | French: | Bases de données d'indexation pour informations | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 29.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/50] | 29.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LIU L ET AL, "An adaptive approach to query mediation across heterogeneous information sources", COOPERATIVE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, 1996. PROCEEDINGS., FIRST IFCIS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BRUSSELS, BELGIUM 19-21 JUNE 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC P, US, (19960619), ISBN 0-8186-7505-5, pages 144 - 156, XP010200757 [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * * page 146, column L * * page 147, column L, paragraph L - column R * * page 148, column R - page 149, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COOPIS.1996.555006 | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "JDBC Guide: Getting Started", INTERNET, (19970306), XP002069529 [X] 1-20 * paragraph [1.1.2] * * paragraph [1.1.1] * * paragraph [1.1.4] * * paragraph [1.2.1] * | [X] - SHUPING RAN ET AL, "The rigorous evaluation of enterprise java bean technology", INFORMATION NETWORKING, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 31 JANUARY - 2 FEBRUARY 2, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (2001), ISBN 0-7695-0951-7, pages 93 - 100, XP010534260 [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [002.] , [2.1.] , [4.1.2.] * | [X] - BERTIN E ET AL, "Integration of Heterogenous Database Applications Through an Object-Oriented Interface", INFORMATION SYSTEMS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (1989), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0306-4379, pages 407 - 420, XP002094517 [X] 1-20 * figures 1a,1b * * page 410, column L - page 411, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4379(89)90005-7 |