Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1708104
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.11.2010 |
Refusal of application |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
26.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
12.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.06.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.05.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
13.04.2007 |
First examination report |
|
11.04.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
01.09.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |