19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
18.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
18.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
28.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
17.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
08.10.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
10.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
30.10.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
23.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.06.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.06.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
06.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.05.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
First examination report |
|
29.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
24.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |