Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7966359 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2011 | B2 | US2007224965 | 27.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06111566 | 22.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5730824B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B2 | JP2012239192 | 06.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06111566 | 22.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5101910B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2012 | B2 | JP2007259447 | 04.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06111566 | 22.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1837994 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2009 | B1 | EP1837994 | 26.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06111566 | 22.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE450928T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP06111566 | 22.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006010810D1 | 14.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP06111566 | 22.03.2006 |