EP1837719 - Balance for a clock movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nivarox-FAR S.A. Avenue du Collège 10 CH-2400 Le Locle / CH | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verardo, Marco Au Jourez 2336 Les Bois / CH | 02 /
Graf, Emmanuel Ph. -Henri-Mathey 4 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | 03 /
Füssinger, Alexandre Les Moteresse 4 2075 Wavre / CH | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 06111726.3 | 24.03.2006 | [2007/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837719 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837719 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/06, G04B18/00 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
G04B17/063 (EP,US);
G04B1/00 (KR);
G04B17/32 (KR);
G04B18/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | 26.03.2008 | BA | 26.03.2008 | HR | 26.03.2008 | MK | 26.03.2008 | YU | 26.03.2008 | Title | German: | Unruh für Uhrwerk | [2007/39] | English: | Balance for a clock movement | [2007/39] | French: | Balancier pour mouvement d'horlogerie | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | CH | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | IE | 03.06.2009 | IT | 03.06.2009 | LI | 03.06.2009 | LT | 03.06.2009 | LV | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | PL | 03.06.2009 | RO | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | ES | 14.09.2009 | IS | 03.10.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | [2019/13] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
TR | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]IT578680 (ROLEX) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 31 - line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US1350035 (INGILD POVELSEN) [A] 1 * column 3, line 56 - line 65 * * column 4, line 112 - line 130 ** figure - *; | [A]FR936423 (MARTI ET BRAUNSCHWEIG) [A] 1-7 * page 1, column 2, line 39 - line 53 * * figure 1 *; | [A]CH276197 (CALAME ARISTE [CH]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 15 - line 23 * * column 2, line 41 - line 46 * * figure 1 * |