EP1840650 - Positive type radiation-sensitive resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuji, Takayuki JSR Corp. 5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Tomoki JSR CORPORATION 5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 03 /
Harada, Kentarou JSR CORPORATION 5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Daisuke JSR CORPORATION 5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06111812.1 | 28.03.2006 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050093385 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005093385 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840650 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840650 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, G03F7/039 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,US);
Y10S430/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Positive strahlungsempfindliche Harzzusammensetzung | [2007/40] | English: | Positive type radiation-sensitive resin composition | [2007/40] | French: | Composition de résine sensible aux radiations de type positif | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.2009 | BE | 18.03.2009 | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | LV | 18.03.2009 | NL | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | IE | 28.03.2009 | LU | 28.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | ES | 29.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | PT | 27.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 28.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JP2001075283 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DY] 1-13 * page 35; examples III-10 *; | [A]EP1238972 (JSR CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0111] - [0113]; examples 6,9; table 1 *; | [DY]JP2004219963 (JSR CORP) [DY] 1-13 * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] - [0044] - [0046]; examples 3,9; table 1 * |