Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007106653 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A3 | WO2007106653 | 20.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007087090 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007087090 | 02.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7889502 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7573717 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2009 | B2 | US2008218977 | 11.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US4508608 | 10.03.2008 | US46644906 | 22.08.2006 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7505275 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2009 | B2 | US2007139895 | 21.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7365988 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2008 | B2 | US2007103875 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US46644906 | 22.08.2006 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101219566B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2013 | B1 | KR20080102300 | 24.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | WO2007US62642 | 23.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100892190B | Global Dossier | 07.04.2009 | B1 | KR20070048635 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US46644906 | 22.08.2006 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010511289 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | WO2007US62642 | 23.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007227880 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US46644906 | 22.08.2006 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1994813 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2010 | A4 | EP1994813 | 26.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | WO2007US62642 | 23.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1784007 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | B1 | EP1784007 | 14.10.2009 | A3 | EP1784007 | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US46644906 | 22.08.2006 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100539815C | 09.09.2009 | C | CN1984543 | 20.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101536623B | 02.01.2013 | B | CN101536623 | 16.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | WO2007US62642 | 23.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2539274T | 29.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US46644906 | 22.08.2006 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1137894 | 06.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | WO2007US62642 | 23.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200742133 | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US37766206 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI375493B | 21.10.2012 | B | TW200810621 | 16.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7303005 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2007 | B2 | US2007102142 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100982583B | Global Dossier | 15.09.2010 | B1 | KR20070048592 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3183143U | Global Dossier | 09.05.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5249505B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B2 | JP2007129201 | 24.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1783833 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2009 | A3 | EP1783833 | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1960619B | 05.09.2012 | B | CN1960619 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US26793305 | 04.11.2005 | US33933806 | 25.01.2006 |