EP1712986 - Method and system for printing data utilising a message signalling service and corresponding computer program and corresponding computer-readable storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cortado AG Alt-Moabit 91 a/b 10559 Berlin / DE | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Thinprint AG Alt Moabit 91b 10559 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states ThinPrint GmbH Alt-Moabit 90 10559 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAPPE, Bernd Otto-Franke-Str. 27 12489, Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHIEBERLEIN, Jochen Holenbrunner Weg 8a 12247, Berlin / DE | 03 /
PREUSSLER, Danny Straßmannstr. 10 10294, Berlin / DE | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2006/42] | Ziebig, Marlene Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06112655.3 | 13.04.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | DE20051017729 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017729 | DE20051018971 | 19.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005018971 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1712986 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1712986 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/1236 (EP);
G06F3/1213 (EP);
G06F3/1292 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Ausdrucken von Daten bei Nutzung eines Nachrichten-Signalisierungs-Services, sowie ein entsprechendes Computerprogramm und ein entsprechendes computerlesbares Speichermedium | [2006/42] | English: | Method and system for printing data utilising a message signalling service and corresponding computer program and corresponding computer-readable storage medium | [2006/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à l'impression de données utilisant un service de signalisation d'informations, et programme informatique et support de stockage correspondants | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/24] | 27.03.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/24] | Appeal following examination | 29.09.2014 | Appeal received No. T2287/14 | 27.11.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.11.2017 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/44] | 11.01.2018 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/02] | 27.03.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 27.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004185877 (ASTHANA ATUL [CA], et al) [I] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1178392 (FUTURELINK CANADA CORP [CA]) [I] 1,12-14,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048]; figure 3 *; | [I]EP1471418 (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1,12-14,16 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0074] *; | [I]EP1291787 (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1,12-14,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0032]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0058] *; | [I]EP1271297 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [I] 1,12-14,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figure 9a * * paragraph [0045] * | by applicant | US2004185877 | EP1178392 | EP1471418 | EP1291787 | EP1271297 |