EP1719606 - Apparatus for welding ends of plastics pipes located on-site [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RITMO S.p.A. Via A. Volta, 7 35037 Teolo (Padova) / IT | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bortoli, Renzo Via Liviana, 88 35038 TORREGLIA PD / IT | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06112958.1 | 24.04.2006 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | IT2005PD00124 | 03.05.2005 Original published format: IT PD20050124 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1719606 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1719606 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/20, B29C65/78 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B29C65/2092 (EP,US);
B29C65/7802 (EP,US);
B29C65/7841 (EP,US);
B29C66/02241 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/86521 (EP,US);
B29C66/861 (EP,US);
B29C66/9141 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | B29C65/20 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/06] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verschweissen von Kunststoffrohrenden vor Ort | [2006/45] | English: | Apparatus for welding ends of plastics pipes located on-site | [2006/45] | French: | Appareil pour souder les extrémités de tuyaux en plastique localisés sur site | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]US5814182 (MCELROY II ARTHUR H [US], et al) [DY] 1,4 * figures 2,3,5,5A * * column 1, lines 5-10 * * column 2, lines 8-12,28-32,54-61 * * column 3, lines 1-10,15-26 * * column 5, lines 35-54 * * column 6, lines 3-5 * * column 10, lines 3-6,32-36,53-60 * * column 11, lines 8-11 * * column 12, lines 54-59 * * column 24, lines 11-21 * [A] 6; | [Y]US4990209 (RAKES GEORGE C [US]) [Y] 1,4 * column 3, lines 9-11,25-45,57-63; figures 1-3 * * column 5, lines 36-43 * * column 6, lines 15-18 * * column 7, lines 7-12,16-21 *; | [A]US5843271 (ANDREW BILL DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,9,10 * figures 4,5 *; | [E]DE202006003138U (SIMONA AG [DE]) [E] 1-4,6-12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0045] , [0046]; figure 6 * |