EP1849732 - Clearance limiter for elevator car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Daniel Au Lionard 1867 Ollon/VD / CH | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Bogensberger Patent- & Markenbüro Fallsgasse 7 9492 Eschen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2007/44] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / NW / CH | Application number, filing date | 06112959.9 | 24.04.2006 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849732 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B11/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B66B5/0081 (EP);
B66B19/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/28] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spaltbegrenzer für eine Aufzugskabine | [2007/44] | English: | Clearance limiter for elevator car | [2007/44] | French: | Limiteur de vide pour une cabine d'ascenseur | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2002128433 ; | [XY]JPH08133617 ; | [Y]US2005252726 (DET FRANCK [FR], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002128433 A 20020509 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * [Y] 3 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08133617 A 19960528 (MITSUBISHI DENKI BILL TECHNO SERVICE KK) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 3 |