EP1717881 - Polymer battery pack and manufacturing method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Heui Sang 428-5, Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06113043.1 | 25.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | KR20050034724 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: KR 20050034724 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717881 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717881 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M10/40, H01M6/18 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/105 (KR);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M50/119 (KR);
H01M50/121 (KR);
H01M50/126 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/133 (KR);
H01M50/178 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/124 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/28] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polymerbatteriepack und dessen Herstellungsmethode | [2006/44] | English: | Polymer battery pack and manufacturing method of the same | [2006/44] | French: | Bloc de batterie polymère et méthode de fabrication d'un tel bloc | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004221024 ; | [A]EP1003233 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-48* page 2, lines 43-48; figure 1 *; | [X]US2002142195 (EHARA YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1-48 * page 1, paragraphs 6-8,10 - page 3, paragraph 44 * * page 5, paragraph 60 *; | [X]US2003165736 (HIRATSUKA MASARU [JP]) [X] 1-48 * page 2, paragraphs 19,22 - page 4, paragraphs 43,53 *; | [X]EP1343210 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-48 * column 2, lines 19-33,44-49 - column 5, lines 2-4,10-12; claims 2,6 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 57, Database accession no. 2004-585178, XP002384434 & JP2004221024 A 20040805 (HITACHI MAXELL KK) [X] 1-48 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1343210 |