EP1726644 - Cellulase variants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Kim Vilbour Karlstad Allé 7 2700 Brönshöj / DK | 02 /
Christiansen, Lars Krogvej 18 2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
Damgaard, Bo c/o Novozymes A/S, Krogshöjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
Schülein, Martin deceased / DK | [2006/48] | Application number, filing date | 06113064.7 | 17.09.1997 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | DK19960001013 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: DK 101396 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726644 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/42 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C11D3/38645 (EP,US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2006/48] | Title | German: | Zellulase Varianten | [2006/48] | English: | Cellulase variants | [2006/48] | French: | Variants de cellulase | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97939989.6 / EP0937138 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970939989) is 22.08.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9117243 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9407998 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-36 * the claims; page 21 lines 15 -40; page 23 line 41 - page 24 line 9 *; | [X]WO9502042 (BIOMOLECULAR RES INST LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-36 * abstract *; | [X]WO9524471 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-36 * page 6, line 10 line 15; page 11, line 16- page 12, line 20; page 17, line 14. line 25; claims 1, 15-18; page 8, line 2 -line 14 *; | [X]WO9617994 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-13,30 * abstract *; | [X]WO9623874 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 31-34 * abstract *; | [X] - PONS JAUME ET AL, "Contribution of a disulfide bridge to the stability of 1,3-1,4-beta-D-glucan 4-glucanohydrolase from Bacillus licheniformis", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 8, no. 9, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 939 - 945, XP008070219 [X] 14-19 * the whole document * | [A] - HAHN MICHAEL ET AL, "Crystal Structure and Site-directed Mutagenesis of Bacillus macerans Endo-1,3-1,4-beta-glucanase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 7, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3081 - 3088, XP002403481 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.7.3081 | [A] - DAVIES GIDEON J ET AL, "Structure and function of endoglucanase V", NATURE (LONDON), (1993), vol. 365, no. 6444, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 362 - 364, XP002403482 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/365362a0 |