EP1736821 - Antipiracy container particularly for carrying film reels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Control Cine Service Italia s.r.l. Vicolo Mazzini 18/4 35137 Padova / IT | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeni, Gian Antonio Via Bachelet, 34 35020, PONTE SAN NICOLO' PD / IT | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06114789.8 | 31.05.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | IT2005PD00187 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: IT PD20050187 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736821 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736821 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/32, A45C13/20 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
G03D13/002 (EP);
A45C13/18 (EP);
A45C11/00 (EP);
A45C13/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | G03B21/32, G11B33/04, A45C13/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | 05.09.2008 | BA | 05.09.2008 | HR | 05.09.2008 | MK | 05.09.2008 | YU | 05.09.2008 | Title | German: | Sicherheitsbehälter für Filmspulen | [2006/52] | English: | Antipiracy container particularly for carrying film reels | [2006/52] | French: | Récipient anti-vol pour bobines de film | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4331257 (TASCHNER WOLFGANG) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 5; claim 1 * [A] 2-17; | [A]US4779732 (BOEHM UDO [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* column 6, line 12 - column 8, line 31 *; | [A]US4927074 (LARUE JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 20 *; | [Y]US5193759 (BIGELOW DONALD O [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]US5255797 (KOS ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 28 *; | [A]US5833067 (JOSHI SHAILENDRA MULSHANKER [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 53 *; | [A]US2003089634 (MASON HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 3, paragraph 42 - page 5, paragraph 80 * | by applicant | US4331257 | US5193759 |