EP1864941 - Quick release capping head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obrist Closures Switzerland GmbH Römerstrasse 83 4153 Reinach / CH | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moesch, Peter Im Reinacherhof 229 4153 Reinach / CH | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 06115071.0 | 07.06.2006 | [2007/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864941 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B67B3/20 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
B67B3/2066 (EP);
B67B2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/34] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schnellwechselschraubkopf | [2007/50] | English: | Quick release capping head | [2007/50] | French: | Tête de vissage à fixation rapide | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001054273 (GRUSON BERTRAND [FR]) [A] 1,8,10 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]EP1245525 (RONCHI MARIO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0850872 (RONCHI MARIO S R L [IT]); | [A]EP1273551 (MBF SPA [IT]); | [A]DE19755727 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP1295842 (LENZI MAURO [IT]) |