EP1710432 - Wind power generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STX Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 66-5, Sinchondong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-371 / KR | For all designated states Xiangtan Electric Manufacturing Corporation, Ltd. No. 302 St. Xiashesi Yuetang District Xiangtan City, Hunan 411101 / CN | [2014/18] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states STX Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 66-5, Sinchondong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-371 / KR | ||
For all designated states Xiangtan Electric Manufacturing Corporation, Ltd. No. 302 St. Xiashesi Yuetang District Xiangtan City, Hunan 411101 / CN | |||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states STX Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 66-5, Sinchondong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-371 / KR | ||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Harakosan Co. Ltd. Daiichi Harakosan Bldg. 26-1 Hatabumiyanoshita-cho Shimonoseki-shi Yamaguchi-ken 751-0829 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGERWEY, Hendrik Lambertus Tjaskerstraat 9 3774 CT, Kootwijk / NL | [2014/18] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
LAGERWEY, Hendrik Lambertus Tjaskerstraat 9 3774 CT, Kootwijk / NL | Representative(s) | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Part mbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf Indeig B.V. Bloemendaalseweg 277A, P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | Application number, filing date | 06115518.0 | 25.09.2000 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710432 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710432 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
H02K7/1838 (EP);
F03D80/70 (EP);
F16C33/6674 (EP);
F16C33/6685 (EP);
H02K7/085 (EP);
F16C19/184 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/41] | Title | German: | Windkraftanlage | [2006/41] | English: | Wind power generator | [2006/41] | French: | Eolienne | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Observations by third parties | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00970307.5 / EP1218638 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000970307) is 29.10.2004 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2006 | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2006 | 30.09.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2006 | 30.09.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2006 | 30.09.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | IE | 25.09.2014 | LU | 25.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/37] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3231016 (THYSSEN INDUSTRIE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * page 6, paragraph 3 *; | [DA]DE4402184 (KLINGER FRIEDRICH PROF DR ING [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19636591 (KLINGER FRIEDRICH PROF DR ING [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3231016 |