Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1870901
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.10.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
30.07.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.03.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.2009 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
01.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
24.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
27.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.08.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
29.07.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2008 |
First examination report |
|
12.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
23.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |