EP1870901 - Page buffer for multi-level nand flash memories [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | For all designated states Hynix Semiconductor Inc. San 136-1, Ami-ri, Bubal-eub Ichon-si Kyoungki-do 467-701 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
For all designated states Hynix Semiconductor Inc. San 136-1, Ami-ri, Bubal-eub Ichon-si Kyoungki-do 467-701 / KR | |||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Hynix Semiconductor Inc. San 136-1, Ami-ri, Bubal-eub Ichon-si Kyoungki-do 467-701 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crippa, Luca Via Manzoni, 66 I-20040 Busnago (MI) / IT | 02 /
Micheloni, Rino Via Luini, 11 I-22078 Turate (CO) / IT | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Maccalli, Marco, et al Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l., Via Settembrini, 40 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06115809.3 | 21.06.2006 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870901 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/56, G11C7/10, G11C16/24 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G11C7/1021 (EP,US);
G11C11/5628 (EP,US);
G11C11/5642 (EP,US);
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
G11C16/3459 (EP,US);
G11C7/1039 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5621 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/36] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Seitenpuffer für mehrstufigen NAND-Flash-Speicher | [2010/02] | English: | Page buffer for multi-level nand flash memories | [2007/52] | French: | Tampon de page pour une mémoire flash NON-ET | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/52] | Seitenpuffer für Mehrstuffigen NAND-Flash-Speichern | Examination procedure | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5751634 (ITOH YASUO [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US2006104112 (HOSONO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0193] - [0231] - [0356] - [0423] * | by applicant | US2006104112 |