EP1835456 - Image authentication system, image authentication method, printed image, and computer product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiba, Hirotaka c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Noda, Tsugio c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06116029.7 | 26.06.2006 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | JP20060071789 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006071789 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835456 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
G06T1/0021 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0051 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/22] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildauthentifizierungssystem, Bildauthentifizierungsverfahren, Druckbild und Computerprodukt | [2007/38] | English: | Image authentication system, image authentication method, printed image, and computer product | [2007/38] | French: | Système d'authentification d'images, procédé d'authentification d'images, image imprimée et produit informatique | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 20.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0209019 (DIGIMARC CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 30, lines 1-9 * * page 25, line 27 - page 26, line 9 *; | [A]WO0237331 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-9* page 19, line 4 - page 20, line 3; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP1480163 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0214]; figure 3; claims 1,4,9,10 *; | [A] - YEUNG M M ET AL, "AN INVISIBLE WATERMARKING TECHNIQUE FOR IMAGE VERIFICATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 1998. SANTA BARBARA, CA, OCT. 26 - 29, 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, (19971026), VOL. 2, ISBN 0-8186-8184-5, pages 680 - 683, XP000957435 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 680, column R, lines 21-40 * * page 682, column L, lines 1-53 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.638587 |