EP1757760 - Fitting component for an espagnolette fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 48291 Telgte / DE | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niehues, Stefan Neuwarendorf 70 D 48231, Warendorf / DE | 02 /
Kaup, Ludger Südstr. 72 48153, Münster / DE | 03 /
Lau, Wolfgang Otto-Hahn-Str. 15 48291, Telgte / DE | 04 /
Hakenes, Andreas Am Roggenkamp 100 48165, Münster / DE | [2007/09] | Application number, filing date | 06116071.9 | 26.06.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | DE20051000100 | 28.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005000100 | [2007/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757760 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1757760 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/18 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
E05C9/1858 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Title | German: | Beschlagteil für einen Treibstangenbeschlag | [2007/09] | English: | Fitting component for an espagnolette fitting | [2007/09] | French: | Elément de ferrure pour ferrure à crémone | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.06.2008 | CZ | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | IE | 04.06.2008 | IT | 04.06.2008 | LT | 04.06.2008 | LV | 04.06.2008 | NL | 04.06.2008 | RO | 04.06.2008 | SI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | LU | 26.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | ES | 15.09.2008 | IS | 04.10.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | HU | 05.12.2008 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/16] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
LT | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
LV | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 04.06.2008 | |
ES | 15.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3345814 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE29914072U (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE19920832 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10158359 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * abstract * |