EP1872814 - Medical system for performing a fluidic treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBIOTECH S.A. Immeuble "Le Portique" Rue de Sévelin 28 1004 Lausanne / CH | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evering, Hans-Gerd rte des Cerisiers 27 1802, Corseaux / CH | 02 /
Neftel, Frédéric, Dr. ch. de Bellevue 36 1005, Lausanne / CH | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 06116174.1 | 27.06.2006 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872814 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28, A61M1/34, A61M1/16, G06F19/00, B65D77/06 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/1656 (EP);
A61M1/166 (EP,US);
A61M1/1668 (EP,US);
A61M1/28 (EP);
A61M1/34 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
A61M1/159 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3393 (EP);
A61M2205/35 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/587 (EP);
A61M2205/6018 (EP);
A61M2205/6054 (EP);
A61M2205/6072 (EP);
A61M2205/6081 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer Flüssigkeitsbehandlung | [2008/01] | English: | Medical system for performing a fluidic treatment | [2008/01] | French: | Système médical pour traitement de fluides | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4043501 (LARRABEE EDWARD WHITTUM, et al) [Y] 14-18 * figures 1,6,7 * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 14 ** column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 31 *; | [YA]EP0112104 (NIPPON MEDICAL SUPPLY [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * figure 3 * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 23 * [A] 1,2; | [Y]US5053003 (DADSON JOSEPH E [CA], et al) [Y] 9,10,12 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 4 - line 23 *; | [Y]DE19751072 (LMB TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 39; figure 4 * * column 7, line 7 - line 32 *; | [Y]US2001040127 (DONIG RAINER [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10,12,13 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] *; | [XY]US2002038392 (DE LA HUERGA CARLOS [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 3,26,30 * * paragraphs [0102] , [0184] - [0187] - [0194] , [0195] , [0208] , [0211] , [0251] * [Y] 7-18; | [XY]US2002147423 (BURBANK JEFFREY H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0054] - [0057] - [0061] , [0070] * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US2002177799 (RIVERA JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 9,11 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] , [0031] * * figure 3 * |