EP1739145 - Composition of a abradable material, thermomechanical piece or carter comprising a coating and process for making or repairing a coating made from this composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/01] | Composition of a abradable material, thermomechanical piece or carter comprising a coating and process for making or repairing a coating made from this compostion | ||
[2009/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2009/38] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Biez, Philippe 3, rue Tamponnet 91210, Draveil / FR | 02 /
Mons, Claude 1, Rond Point de la Corrèze 77176, Savigny Le Temple / FR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06116197.2 | 28.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | FR20050006736 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506736 | [2007/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739145 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739145 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, F04D29/16, F01D11/12, C08K7/24, C08K7/26 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
F04D29/164 (EP,US);
B23P6/002 (EP,US);
B29C39/10 (EP,US);
B29C67/246 (EP,US);
C08K7/24 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
F01D11/122 (EP,US);
F04D29/023 (EP,US);
B29K2083/00 (EP,US);
F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2250/241 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K7/24, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für ein abreibbares Material, thermomechanisches Teil oder Gehäuse enthaltend eine Beschichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung oder Instandsetzung einer Beschichtung aus dieser Zusammensetzung | [2009/11] | English: | Composition of a abradable material, thermomechanical piece or carter comprising a coating and process for making or repairing a coating made from this composition | [2009/11] | French: | Composition de matériau abradable, pièce thermomécanique ou carter comprenant un revêtement et procédé de fabrication ou de réparation d'un revêtement présentant cette composition | [2007/01] |
Former [2007/01] | Zusammensetzung für ein abreibares Material, thermomechanischer Teil oder Gehäuse enthaltend eine Beschichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung oder Instandesetzung einer Beschichtung aus dieser Zusammensetzung | ||
Former [2007/01] | Composition of a abradable material, thermomechanical piece or carter comprising a coating and process for making or repairing a coating made from this compostion | Examination procedure | 28.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 06.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4580794 (GIBBONS ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 68; examples 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP1046671 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011]; example 1; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US6287372 (BRIAND REMI [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 44; example 1; claims 1,2,4 * [Y] 5-15; | [A]WO03064221 (CORUS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1413771 (SNECMA MOTEURS [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; claims 6-8 * [Y] 5-15; | [XY]EP1426559 (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * claims 1-5 * [Y] 5-15 |