EP1873077 - Rotatable closure cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states capArtis AG Grabenstrasse 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states CapArtis AG Grabenstrasse 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wohlgenannt, Herbert Lohningerweg 7 8240 Thayngen / CH | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / SG / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Dr. Graf & Partner Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2008/01] | Dr. Graf & Partner Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 06116327.5 | 29.06.2006 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873077 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/24, B65D47/26, B65D41/04, B65D41/18, B65D47/06, B65D41/34 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B65D47/242 (EP);
B65D41/0414 (EP);
B65D47/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drehverschlusskappe | [2008/01] | English: | Rotatable closure cap | [2008/01] | French: | Fermeture rotative | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3258179 (SAMUEL CHERBA) [X] 1,8-11,15 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 24; figures 6-9 *; | [X]US3261513 (MORAN JAMES G) [X] 1,3-5,8,10,11,14,15 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 2; figures 1-6 *; | [X]CA848785 (ANCHOR CAP AND CLOSURE CORP OF) [X] 1,3,15,16 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 30; figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2619084 (KERPLAS SNC [FR]) [X] 1,9,11,15,16 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 1; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0529383 (BERG JACOB GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 17* column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 3; figures 1,2 * |