EP1750059 - Gas cooking hob [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrera Estrada, Pedro Avda. del deporte n°3 Bloque 5 Piso.4°A 39011, Santander / ES | 02 /
Leon Garcia, Jose Vista Alegre 10-1°C 39007, Santander / ES | 03 /
Palacios Valdueza, Luis Antonio Leonardo Torres Quevedo n°2 4°lzda. 39610, Astillero / ES | 04 /
Placer Maruri, Emilio Paseo de Canalejas N°21 3°A 39004, Santander / ES | [2007/06] | Application number, filing date | 06116523.9 | 03.07.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | ES20050002042 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: ES 200502042 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750059 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1750059 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/12, F24C3/12, F23K5/14 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
F24C3/126 (EP,ES);
F23K5/147 (EP);
F23N5/123 (EP);
F23N2227/36 (ES);
F23N2235/14 (ES);
F23N5/10 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | Gaskochfeld | [2007/06] | English: | Gas cooking hob | [2007/06] | French: | Réchaud à gaz | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 01.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19825846 (AGT GAS TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP1215441 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) | by applicant | DE19825846 |