EP1744274 - Privileged conversation management method within an instant conversation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Exploitant Autonome de Droit Public, 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dauguet, Anthony Le Haut Pavé 14260, SAINT PIERRE DU FRESNE / FR | 02 /
Briand, Olivier 24, boulevard Georges Pompidou 14000, CAEN / FR | 03 /
Ferron, Sophie 1, pré des Bonnets Rouges 35000, RENNES / FR | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Desormiere, Pierre-Louis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Desormiere, Pierre-Louis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06116579.1 | 04.07.2006 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | FR20050007445 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0507445 | [2007/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1744274 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1744274 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, // H04L12/58 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L51/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Vorranggesprächen in einem System für Sofortgespräche | [2007/03] | English: | Privileged conversation management method within an instant conversation system | [2007/03] | French: | Procédé de gestion de conversation privilégiée dans un système de conversations instantanées | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004080015 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,9,12,14,15 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 33 * [Y] 2-4,6-8,10,11,13; | [Y]WO0207396 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 4,8,11 * page 2, line 6 - line 22 * * page 3, line 18 - line 29 * * page 7, line 33 - page 10, line 4 * * page 13, line 1 - line 24 * | [Y] - BAKER J POLK CISCO SYSTEMS F, "Implementing MLPP for Voice and Video in the Internet Protocol Suite; draft-ietf-tsvwg-mlpp-that-works-00.txt;", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20050207), vol. tsvwg, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015039107 [Y] 2,3,6,7,10,13 * paragraphs [01.1] , [02.1] * | by applicant | WO2004080015 | WO0207396 |