EP1848228 - System and Method of Providing Information Access on a Portable Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bumiller, George Baldwin 39 Lakeview Terrace Ramsey, NJ 07446 / US | 02 /
Crowley, Mike 13516 Fishing Hole Lane Haslet, TX 76052 / US | 03 /
Estable, Luis Pablo 51 rue de l'Alouette Hull Québec J9A 3J3 / CA | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
Bumiller, George Baldwin 39 Lakeview Terrace Ramsey, NJ 07446 / US | ||
02 /
Crowley, Mike 13516 Fishing Hole Lane Haslet, TX 76052 / US | |||
03 /
Estable, Luis Pablo 51 rue de l'Alouette Hull Québec J9A 3J3 / CA | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/17] |
Former [2010/02] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06117187.2 | 13.07.2006 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | US20060792918P | 18.04.2006 Original published format: US 792918 P | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848228 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848228 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22, H04W88/02 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G16H10/65 (EP,BR,US);
G06F21/60 (BR,US);
G06F15/02 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
H04M1/72424 (EP,BR,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | 19.07.2006 | BA | 19.07.2006 | HR | 19.07.2006 | MK | 19.07.2006 | RS | 19.07.2006 | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Informationszugang bei einer tragbaren Vorrichtung | [2007/43] | English: | System and Method of Providing Information Access on a Portable Device | [2007/43] | French: | Système et procédé fournissant l'accès aux informations sur un dispositif portable | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 20.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 06.10.2009 | Appeal received No. T0079/10 | 04.12.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.12.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 14.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP09163500.3 / EP2099255 | EP10184023.9 / EP2284745 | EP17193911.9 / EP3285192 | EP22197872.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2006 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | IE | 13.07.2012 | LU | 13.07.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 13.07.2012 | ||
LU | 13.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 13.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 13.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 13.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004120467 ; | [X]US2002131330 (ZION JOSEF [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] *; | [X]GB2401285 (RUSSELL MARC [GB], et al) [X] 1-51 * page 1 *; | [X]WO2004104898 (FAIRCLOUGH ROBERT [GB], et al) [X] 1-51 * page 3, lines 1-5 ** page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 8 *; | [X]WO2005069676 (FIRST AID CARD ENTPR AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-51 * page 2, lines 4-14 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 4 * * page 7, line 26 - page 9, line 15 * * page 12, lines 14-25 *; | [X]US2006079269 (SOROTZKIN MOSHE [IL]) [X] 1-51 * paragraph [0063] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004120467 A 20040415 (SATO CORP) [X] 1-51 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2004120467 | GB2401285 | WO2004104898 |