EP1814313 - Upright infrared camera with foldable monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou SAT Infrared Technology Co., Ltd. 10 Dongjian Avenue Guangzhou Economic & Techn. Development District Guangzhou 510730 / CN | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Jiping 10 Dongjiang Avenue Guangzhou Economic & T. D. District 510730, Guangzhou / CN | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06117297.9 | 17.07.2006 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | CN2006201956 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: CN200620001956 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814313 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1814313 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
H04N23/531 (EP,US);
H04N23/20 (EP);
H04N5/33 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Aufrecht stehende Infrarotkamera mit klappbarem Monitor | [2007/31] | English: | Upright infrared camera with foldable monitor | [2007/31] | French: | Caméra infrarouge vertical avec écran de visualisation pliable | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0825768 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | JP2000101879 [ ] (CANON KK); | JP2000101877 [ ] (CANON KK); | JP2000101876 [ ] (CANON KK); | [X]EP1503579 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]US2005157209 (CHA MIN-HO [KR], et al); | JP2005304067 [ ] (CANON KK); | [PX]US7046286 (KOBAYASHI JUNJI [JP], et al) |