EP1747774 - Use of a composition comprising a colouring agent of the styrylic or imino type for dyeing keratinuous fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states L'Oreal 14 Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plos, Grégory Gluck Heim Yoga 206 2-12-4 Yoga Setagaya-Ku Tokyo 158-0097 / JP | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Prevel, Estelle Nicole L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Prevel, Estelle Nicole L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29, Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06117400.9 | 18.07.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | FR20050052277 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0552277 | [2007/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747774 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747774 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61Q5/10, A61Q5/06, C07D498/04, C07D263/04, C07D209/14 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61K8/49 (EP,US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
A61K2800/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein Farbstoff vom Styryl- oder Imintyp zur Färbung keratinischer Fasern | [2007/05] | English: | Use of a composition comprising a colouring agent of the styrylic or imino type for dyeing keratinuous fibres | [2007/05] | French: | Utilisation pour la coloration des fibres kératiniques d'une composition comprenant un colorant de type styrylique ou iminique | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.07.2009 | 06.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.01.2010 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 25.01.2010 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 26.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IE | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | LU | 18.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
LU | 18.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
LU | 18.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001081342 ; | [A]JPS55113710 ; | [A]JPS5531057 ; | [A]JPS5714652 ; | [A]JPS5625106 ; | [Y]US5474578 (CHAN ALEXANDER C [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * examples 8,9; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001081342 A 20010327 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1-35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801129), vol. 004, no. 173, Database accession no. (C - 032), & JP55113710 A 19800902 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1-35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800516), vol. 004, no. 065, Database accession no. (C - 010), & JP55031057 A 19800305 (KANEBO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1-35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820515), vol. 006, no. 078, Database accession no. (C - 102), & JP57014652 A 19820125 (NIPPON KANKO SHIKISO KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1-35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810519), vol. 005, no. 075, Database accession no. (C - 055), & JP56025106 A 19810310 (KANEBO KESHOHIN KK) [A] 1-35 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2285439 | JPS5531057 | JPS55113710 | JPS5625106 | JPS5681522 | JPS56150006 | US4380629 | - J. H. WEIL, BIOCHIMIE GéNéRALE, (1983), page 5 | - LUBERT STRYER, BIOCHIMIE GENERALE, (1995), page 22 | - A. LEHNINGER, BIOCHIMIE GENERALE, (1993), pages 115 - 116 | - DE BOECK-WESMAEL, BIOCHIMIE GENERALE, (1994), pages 57 - 59 |