EP1754844 - Decorative glass panel for covering walls. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omni Decor S.p.a. Via Rossini, 4 23847 Molteno LC / IT | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESCIANI, Ferruccio Via Matteotti, 16 22066, MARIANO COMENSE (CO) / IT | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06117404.1 | 18.07.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI01514 | 02.08.2005 Original published format: IT MI20051514 | [2007/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754844 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1754844 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/14, E06B3/54, B32B17/10 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
E06B3/5436 (EP);
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10247 (EP);
B32B17/10293 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP);
E04F13/145 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | E04F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | Dekorative Glasplatte, für das Belegen von Wänden | [2007/08] | English: | Decorative glass panel for covering walls. | [2007/08] | French: | Panneau en verre décoratif, pour le revêtement de parois | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE8701693U (FLACHGLAS AG, 8510 FUERTH, DE) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3; | [XA]EP0340089 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * page 2, column 1, lines 1-4 * * page 3, column 3, lines 5-16,30-33,43-49 * * figures 1,2,4 *[A] 3,4; | [X]WO2004011755 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 6 * * page 5, line 1 - line 10 * * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 10 * * figures 1,2,5,6 * |