EP1716766 - Aiding of cognitive function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2006/44] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYAN, Janet, c/o University of South Australia School of Psychology P.O. Box 2471, Adelaide, SA 5001 / AU | 02 /
VAN KLINKEN, Bernardus Jan-Willem Unilever R&D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2006/50] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
BRYAN, Janet, c/o University of South Australia Centre for Psychol. Research, School of Psychology P.O. Box 2471, Adelaide, SA 5001 / AU | ||
02 /
VAN KLINKEN, Bernardus Jan-Willem Unilever R&D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Representative(s) | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 06117650.9 | 24.06.2004 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | EP20030077270 | 21.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03077270 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716766 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/302, A23L1/304, A23L1/30 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/714 (EP,US);
A21D2/02 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/20, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Unterstützung der Wahrnehmung | [2006/44] | English: | Aiding of cognitive function | [2006/44] | French: | Aide à la fonction cognitive | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/49] | 19.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04740233.4 / EP1643864 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO0062812 (ADVOCARE INTERNAT LLC [US]) [DY] 1-15 * page 12, lines 3-5 * * example 1 * * claims 1,9 *; | [A]US2002045660 (O'CONNOR DEBORAH L [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0064] , [0066] , [0068] , [0071] - [0073] - [0075] , [0116] - [0129] ** page 7; table B *; | [DX]WO03003981 (VITAL BASICS INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-12 * page 4, line 14 - page 8, line 21 * * page 10, lines 17-28 * * page 12, lines 9-19 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 23 * * table 1 * * page 23, line 16 - page 25, line 8 *; | [YD]US2003044472 (LANG PHILIP C [US]) [YD] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 2,13-19 * * page 2, paragraphs 32,33,35-37 * * claim 1 *; | [E]EP1457209 (PHARMATON SA [CH]) [E] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] * * examples 2,3 *; | [YD] - BEARD J, "One person's view of iron deficiency, development and cognitive function", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, BETHESDA,MD, US, (1995), vol. 62, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 709 - 710, XP002393835 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [YD] - NEUMANN C, HARRIS DM, ROGERS LM, "Contribution of animal source foods in improving diet quality and function in children of the developping world", NUTRITION RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 22, pages 193 - 220, XP002257664 [YD] 1-15 * page 198, paragraph 2.1.1 * * page 205, paragraph 3.3.1 * * pages 206-207, paragraph 3.3.2A * * pages 207-208, paragraphs 3.3.2B,,3.3.2C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0271-5317(01)00374-8 | [YD] - SESHADRI S, HIRODE K, NAIK P, MALHOTRA S, "Behavorial responses of young anemic Indian children to iron folic-acid supplements", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV198375074283, URL: BIOSIS, XP002257665 [YD] 1-15 * abstract * |