EP1729292 - Information recording apparatus and information recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-Chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirota, Akira c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 02 /
Horikawa, Kunihiko c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610, Hanazono 4- chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 03 /
Muramatsu, Eiji c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610, Hanazono 4- chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 04 /
Taniguchi, Shoji c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06117714.3 | 10.09.2002 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | JP20010274358 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001274358 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729292 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1729292 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729292 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B7/125, G11B7/0045 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G11B7/00456 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (KR);
G11B7/0062 (EP,US);
G11B7/1263 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/49] | G11B7/0045 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Informationsaufzeichnung | [2006/49] | English: | Information recording apparatus and information recording method | [2006/49] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'enregistrement d'informations | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02767935.6 / EP1425740 | Divisional application(s) | EP07101000.3 / EP1783749 | EP07101021.9 / EP1783750 | EP07101032.6 / EP1783751 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0206824 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 1 - line 27 * * column 8, line 51 - column 11, line 8 *; | [A]US5631887 (HURST JR JERRY E [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 7, line 28 - column 9, line 32 *; | [A]US5732062 (YOKOI KENYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 11, line 38 - column 14, line 38 *; | [A]EP0851413 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 50 * * column 12, line 31 - column 14, line 56 *; | [A]EP0932144 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *; | [A]EP1026671 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 9, line 9 - line 33 *; | [E]EP1249834 (RICOH KK [JP]) [E] 1-20* paragraphs [0054] - [0059]; figures 6,9 * |