EP1885162 - Remote administration of street lighting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stadtwerke Lemgo GmbH Bruchweg 24 32657 Lemgo / DE | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oberscheven, Arnd Breite Strasse 59 32657 Lemgo / DE | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Frank-Michael ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Schmidt, Frank-Michael ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | Schmidt, Frank-Michael Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner GbR Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06117878.6 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1885162 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/00 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
F21V23/0435 (EP);
F21W2131/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Fernschalten von Strassenbeleuchtungen | [2008/06] | English: | Remote administration of street lighting | [2008/06] | French: | Telegestion de l'eclairage urbain | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2601485 (SPIE TRINDEL [FR]); | [X]WO0076034 (LEMPI & COMMAT [FR], et al); | [X]GB2403357 (LIGHTHOUSE DATA MAN LTD [GB]); | [X]GB2408395 (FRAY ROBERT FRANCIS [GB], et al); | [A]DE10351431 (LEHMANN MARIO [DE]) |