EP1752844 - PLC for distributed control and distributed control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | For all designated states Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 35435 Wettenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
For all designated states Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 35435 Wettenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Araki, Tsutomu JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Sutemaro JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Adams, Friedrich Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 D-35435, Wettenberg / DE | 04 /
Niehaus, Michael Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 D-35435, Wettenberg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
Araki, Tsutomu JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Sutemaro JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Adams, Friedrich Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 D-35435, Wettenberg / DE | |||
04 /
Niehaus, Michael Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 D-35435, Wettenberg / DE | |||
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
Araki, Tsutomu JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-k Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Sutemaro JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-k Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Adams, Friedrich Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 D-35435, Wettenberg / DE | |||
04 /
Niehaus, Michael Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Im Ostpark 2 D-35435, Wettenberg / DE | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2007/07] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06118251.5 | 01.08.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | JP20050223887 | 02.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005223887 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1752844 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1752844 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752844 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G05B19/052 (EP,US);
G05B2219/1204 (EP,US);
G05B2219/1208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/08] |
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPS für verteilte Steuerung und verteiltes Steuersystem | [2007/07] | English: | PLC for distributed control and distributed control system | [2007/07] | French: | API pour commande distribuée et système de commande distribuée | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 20.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1231526 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2317461 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1231526 | GB2317461 |