EP1715601 - Linear coverage area antenna system for a CDMA communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dean, Richard F. 556 Apple Valley Road Lyons, Colorado 80540 / US | 02 /
Antonio, Franklin P. 2765 Corbora Cove Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
Dean, Richard F. 5278 Spotted Horse Trail Boulder, CA California 80301 / US | ||
02 /
Antonio, Franklin P. 2765 Corbora Cove Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | |||
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
Dean, Richard F. 5278 Spotted Horse Trail Boulder, CA 80301 / US | ||
02 /
Antonio, Franklin P. 2765 Corbora Cove Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06118376.0 | 07.06.1996 | [2006/43] | Priority number, date | US19950483111 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 483111 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1715601 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H01Q21/29, H04W88/08, H04B7/08, H04B7/26, // H04B7/02, H04B7/06, H04W36/18 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
H04B7/0894 (EP,FI,US);
H04B7/0671 (EP,FI,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H01Q1/246 (FI);
H01Q13/203 (FI);
H01Q21/28 (FI);
H01Q21/29 (EP,US);
H04B7/0491 (EP,US);
H04B7/0845 (EP,US);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04B7/2643 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (FI);
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | H04B7/26, H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/43] | Title | German: | Antennensystem mit langgestreckter Strahlungsdeckung für Cdma-Übertragungssystem | [2006/43] | English: | Linear coverage area antenna system for a CDMA communication system | [2006/43] | French: | Système d'antennes à zone de couverture lineaire pour un système de communication à accès multiple à répartition de codes | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96922416.1 / EP0830754 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960922416) is 11.07.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5018165 (SOHNER HAROLD K [US], et al); | [DX]WO9506365 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) | by applicant | US4901307 | US5056109 | US5101501 | US5103459 | US5109390 | US5280472 | US5442627 | US5490165 | US5506865 | US5513176 | US5654979 | US19900624118 | US19940316177 |