EP1752786 - Hybrid inertial/satellite navigation system and method for the operation of such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem Défense Sécurité Le Ponant de Paris 27 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gavillet, Simon Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc 75015, Paris / FR | 02 /
Vacher, Charlie Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc 75015, Paris / FR | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
Gavillet, Simon Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc 75015, Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Vacher, Charlie Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc 75015, Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2007/07] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06118631.8 | 09.08.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | FR20050008449 | 09.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0508449 | [2007/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752786 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752786 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/20, G01S19/47 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
G01S19/20 (EP);
G01S19/47 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/07] | G01S5/14, G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] |
Former [2007/42] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybrides Trägheit-/Satellitennavigationssystem und Verfahren zur Kontrolle eines solchen Systemes | [2007/07] | English: | Hybrid inertial/satellite navigation system and method for the operation of such a system | [2007/07] | French: | Système de navigation hybride inertiel/satellite et procedé de controle d'un tel système | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time | 09.10.2007 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2007 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2006 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | IE | 09.08.2014 | LU | 09.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.08.2006 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5583774 (DIESEL JOHN W [US]) [X] 1,4-8,12,15-19 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 28-47 * * column 4, lines 12-24 * * column 7, lines 35-65 * * column 8, lines 1-30 * * column 11, lines 3-62 *; | [X]US5600329 (BRENNER MATS A [US]) [X] 1,12 * figures 3-5 * * column 7, lines 1-17 * * column 8, lines 52-65 * * column 11, lines 28-57 * | [XDY] - YOUNG C. LEE, DANIEL G O'LAUGHLIN, "A performance Analysis of a Tightly Coupled GPS/Inertial System for Two Integrity Monitoring Methods", ION GPS/GNSS PROCEEDINGS, US, (19990914), pages 1187 - 1200, XP002382515 [XD] 1,4-9,12,15-20 * page 1189 - page 1191; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,13,14 | [Y] - R. GROVER BROWN, PAUL W. MCBURNEY, "Self-Conatined GPS Integrity Check Using Maximum Solution Separation", NAVIGATION., US, (198803), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 41 - 53, XP008064596 [Y] 2,3,13,14 * page 43 * | [X] - JOHN DIESEL, GREGORY DUNN, "GPS/IRS AIME : Certification for Sole Mans and Solution to RF Interference", ION GPS/GNSS PROCEEDINGS, US, (19960917), pages 1599 - 1606, XP002382516 [X] 1,9-12,20,21 * page 1600 - page 1602; figure 1 * | Examination | - LEE Y C, "Analysis of range and position comparison methods as a means to provide GPS integrity in the user receiver", INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 42ND ANNUAL MEETING, US, (19860626), pages 1 - 17, XP007902751 | - YOUNES A; BAKHACHE B; NIKIFOROV I; BENHALLAM A, "Sequential RAIM : Theory and application to civil aviation needs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 11TH INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, US, (19980918), pages 1993 - 2002, XP007902753 | - BROWN R GROVER ED - PARKINSON B W ET AL, "Receiver Autonomous Integrity Monitoring", GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS; [PROGRESS IN ASTRONAUTICS AND AERONAUTICS VOL. 163], WASHINTON, DC : AIAA, US, (1996), vol. 2, ISBN 978-1-56347-107-0, pages 143 - 165, XP008090948 | - DIESEL J; LUU S, "GPS/IRS AIME: Calculation of Thresholds and Protection Radius Using Chi-Square Methods", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION) GPS,, US, (19950901), pages 1959 - 1964, XP002434515 | by applicant | US5583774 | US5600329 | - DR. YOUNG C. LEE; DANIEL G. O'LAUGHLIN, "A Performance Analysis of a Tightly Coupled GPS/Inertial System for Two Integrity Monitoring Methods", INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, ION GPS-99 | - JOHN DIESEL; GREGORY DUNN, "GPS/IRS AIME : Certification for Sole Mans and Solution to RF Interference", INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, ION GPS-96 |