Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
06.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.09.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
04.09.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
11.09.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.05.2008 | First examination report | |
21.05.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.05.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
25.04.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
07.09.2007 | Publication of search report | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
19.01.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |