EP1900695 - Process and apparatus for cutting glass sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albat + Wirsam Software AG Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 15 35440 Linden / DE | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirsam, Bernd, Dr. Schubertstrasse 4 35440 Linden / DE | 02 /
Albat, Renate, Dr. Breiter Weg 114 35440 Linden / DE | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06119062.5 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900695 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900695 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03B33/037, B65G49/06, G06Q10/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
G06Q10/043 (EP,US);
B65G49/068 (EP,US);
C03B33/0207 (EP,US);
C03B33/037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuschneiden von Rohglasplatten | [2008/12] | English: | Process and apparatus for cutting glass sheets | [2008/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour couper des feuilles de verre | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2006 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | IE | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | LU | 17.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
LU | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH626596 (BYSTRONIC MASCH [CH]) [Y] 1-28 * fig. 1 S. 3, linke Spalte Z. 8-13, rechte Sp., Z. 3-7 S. 4, rechte Sp., Z. 6-64 S. 6, linke Sp., Z. 24-28 *; | [Y]US4709483 (HEMBREE CHARLES B [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * column 2, line 5 - line 44 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 64 *; | [A]JPH06166530 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [DY]WO9622948 (LISEC PETER [AT]) [DY] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1284229 (HEGLA FAHRZEUG U MASCHB GMBH & [DE]) [Y] 1-28 * paragraphs [0005] , [0014] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [DY]EP1319634 (ALBAT & WIRSAM SOFTWARE VERTRI [DE]) [DY] 1-28 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015] - [0024] - paragraphs [0034] , [0037] , [0038] , [0041] , [0046] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] *; | [A]JP2003306338 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [DY]US2003226433 (PASSANT JOHANNES F [US]) [DY] 1-28 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1431215 (BYSTRONIC MASCH [CH]) [Y] 1-28* paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0010] - paragraphs [0015] , [0030]; figure 1 * |