EP1758094 - Component of musical instrument, musical instrument and production method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Junji Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
Abe, Hiroyasu Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte, Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06119219.1 | 21.08.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | JP20050241052 | 23.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005241052 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758094 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10D1/00, G10D7/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G10D3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Title | German: | Komponente eines Musikinstrumentes, Musikinstrument und dessen Produktionsverfahren | [2007/09] | English: | Component of musical instrument, musical instrument and production method of the same | [2007/09] | French: | Composant d'un instrument de musique, instrument de musique et procédé de fabrication pour le même | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/13] | 19.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/13] | Appeal following examination | 28.12.2011 | Appeal received No. T0848/12 | 17.01.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005103182 (SPURGEON STEVE [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]EP1343047 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]EP0936504 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0004] *; | [AD]US1836089 (SCHWEITZER EDMUND O) [AD] 1,5-8 * page 1, line 70 - line 82 * * page 2, line 24 - line 38 * * page 3, line 7 - line 21 * * page 2, line 47 - line 54 *; | [A]EP1531454 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0063] *; | [A]DE365672 (REVALO TONVEREDLUNGS AKT GES) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 34 - line 65 * | by applicant | JP2005241052 | JPH10105159 | US1836089 |