EP1770732 - Turning knob with encoding for a ventilation, a heating or an air conditioning installation of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8 rue Louis Lormand - La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil St Denis Cedex / FR | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huynh, Tan Duc VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 46 avenue Paul Doumer 93330 Neuilly sur Marne / FR | 02 /
Beraud, Henry VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 138 rue de la Jarry 94300 Vincennes / FR | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob, et al Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob, et al InnoVinciA 7, place des Arts 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 06119237.3 | 21.08.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | FR20050010018 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: FR 0510018 | [2007/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1770732 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H19/58 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
H01H19/11 (EP);
H01H19/585 (EP);
H01H3/10 (EP);
H01H19/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | Drehbetätigungsknopf mit Kodierung für eine Lüftung, eine Heizung- oder eine Klimaanlage eines Fahrzeuges | [2007/14] | English: | Turning knob with encoding for a ventilation, a heating or an air conditioning installation of a vehicle | [2007/14] | French: | Bouton de commande rotatif par encodage, pour une installation de ventilation, de chauffage et/ou de climatisation d'un véhicule notamment | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.11.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | 01.11.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.11.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   01.11.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4166200 (LONG SCOTT B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-25 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 52; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US6262378 (CHOU CHIN-WEN [TW]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 5A,5B *; | [A]US3164690 (HEIDE STANFORD M) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 48; figure - *; | [A]US6570105 (SALLAM FAISAL KASSIM [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 2 * |