EP1813702 - Raschel Knitting Machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANTONI S.p.A. Via Carlo Fenzi, 14 25135 Brescia / IT | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lonati, Tiberio Via Sera, 24 25100 Brescia / IT | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Galassi, Alessandro, et al PGA S.p.A. Milano Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Galassi, Alessandro, et al Ponzellini Gioia E Associati S.R.L. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/44] | Tirloni, Bartolomeo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via Dante, 17 25122 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2007/31] | Galassi, Alessandro Bugnion S.p.A., Via Dante, 17 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 06119916.2 | 31.08.2006 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | IT2005BS00146 | 23.11.2005 Original published format: IT BS20050146 | [2007/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1813702 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1813702 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813702 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/04 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
D04B27/04 (EP,US);
Y02P70/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Raschelkettenwirkmaschine | [2007/31] | English: | Raschel Knitting Machine | [2007/31] | French: | Métiers à tricoter Raschel | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: translation not filed in time | 29.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2011/38] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 10.11.2010 | |
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 10.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE813741 (ARTHUR G SCHOLTE) [X] 23 * page 3, lines 46-81; figures 5,6; claims 5,6 *; | [X]US4263791 (HITTEL GERHARD) [X] 23 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 11; figure 3 *; | [A]US5901583 (KEMPER RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 4* column 3, lines 23-48; figure 2; claim 1 * |