EP1759885 - Method for reducing oxygen content in air cavities of mounted tires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Incavo, Joeseph Alan 3970 Walnut Wood Way Uniontown, OH 44685 / US | 02 /
Woodcock, Richard Earl 859 Adam Run Drive, Cuyahoga Falls Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223 / US | 03 /
Lukich, Lewis Timothy 1025 West Market Street Akron OH 44313 / US | 04 /
Johnson, Edward Lee 2880 Arborry Hill Road Richfield, OH 44286 / US | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A., Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 06119923.8 | 31.08.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | US20050220217 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 220217 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1759885 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1759885 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C5/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B60C5/001 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/11] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung des Sauerstoffgehaltes in Lufthohlräumen von montierten Reifen | [2007/10] | English: | Method for reducing oxygen content in air cavities of mounted tires | [2007/10] | French: | Procédé de réduction de la teneur en oxygène en cavités d'air des pneu montés | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB839524 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-4 * page 2, lines 18-21; figure 3 *; | [X]US3370915 (SPERBERG LAWRENCE R) [X] 1,4 * column 3, lines 21-40 *; | [X]US3515181 (SPERBERG LAWRENCE R) [X] 1,4,5 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]US3560143 (SPERBERG LAWRENCE R) [X] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 50 *; | [X]US3877496 (SPERBERG LAWRENCE R) [X] 1,4,5* column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 12; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH08230421 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract * |