EP1829515 - Container and applicator for pharmaceutical or cosmetic products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsaur, Garry 19222 Tranbarger Street Rowland Heights, CA 91748 / US | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Viering, Hans-Martin, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Viering, Hans-Martin, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06119996.4 | 28.04.2004 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | US20030425791 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: US 425791 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829515 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829515 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F15/00, A61F13/28, A61F13/26, A61M35/00, A45D34/04 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G06F16/283 (EP,US);
B01D5/006 (KR);
B01D1/02 (KR);
B01D5/0006 (KR);
B01D5/0075 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | Behälter und Auftrageinrichtung fuer pharmazeutische oder kosmetische Produkte | [2007/36] | English: | Container and applicator for pharmaceutical or cosmetic products | [2007/36] | French: | Conteneur et applicateur pour produits pharmaceutique ou cosmetique | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 03.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04010123.0 / EP1473011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.09.2009 | BG | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SE | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | AT | 28.04.2010 | GB | 28.04.2010 | IE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LU | 28.04.2010 | ES | 29.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
AT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GB | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LU | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
AT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GB | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
AT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GB | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
AT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GB | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
AT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GB | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4799815 (BARABINO WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column A *; | [A]US5364792 (STONE MARCIA J [US]) [A] 1-3* column 10, lines 30-44 *; | [A]EP1234871 (HAYTON ANTHONY JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US5702035 |