EP1762294 - Gas purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde, Inc. Mountain Avenue New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 100 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jain, Ravi The BOC Group, Inc. 15 Moray Avenue Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
Uhlman, Bruce Walter The BOC Group, Inc. 43 Maple Lane Mount Arlington, NJ 07856 / US | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Wickham, Michael, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Wickham, Michael C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06120110.9 | 05.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | US20050714561P | 07.09.2005 Original published format: US 714561 P | US20060506548 | 18.08.2006 Original published format: US 506548 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762294 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1762294 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/22, B01D53/26, C01B31/18, C10K1/00, C10K1/32 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
B01D53/0462 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (KR);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/229 (EP,US);
B01D53/72 (KR);
C01B32/40 (EP,US);
C10K1/32 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/11 (EP,US);
B01D2253/116 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US);
B01D2256/20 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/104 (EP,US);
B01D2257/108 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7025 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40001 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40081 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4009 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D2259/416 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
Y02C20/20 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02P20/151 (EP,US);
Y02P20/156 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | B01D53/04, B01D53/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungsverfahren | [2007/11] | English: | Gas purification | [2007/11] | French: | Procedé d épuration de gaz | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3699218 (SMITH CALVIN S, et al) [A] * column 2, line 15 - line 43; figure 1 ** column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 49 *; | [A]US4914076 (TSUJI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 51 - line 56 * * column 5, line 7 - line 46; claim 1 *; | [A]US5073356 (GURO DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,3,13 * * figures 2,8 * * column 1, lines 6-15 * * column 1, line 51 - line 65 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 25 * * column 9, line 5 - line 15 * * column 12, line 32 - line 41 * * column 25, line 31 - line 48 *; | [A]US2002107294 (HUFTON JEFFREY RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2003009943 (MILLET CYRILLE [FR], et al) [A] * claims 1,8,11,13,15,16 * | by applicant | JPS63247582 | DE4325513 | DE19541339 | US6062042 | US6073461 |