EP1905440 - Use of a pharmaceutical composition comprising an anticholinergic for killing microorganisms and for treating respiratory tract infections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06120196.8 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905440 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/437, A61P11/00 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/50] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung einer pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein Anticholinergikum zur Abtötung von Mikroorganismen und zur Behandlung von Atemwegsinfektionen | [2008/14] | English: | Use of a pharmaceutical composition comprising an anticholinergic for killing microorganisms and for treating respiratory tract infections | [2008/14] | French: | Utilisation d'une composition pharmaceutique comprenant un anticholinergique pour l'élimination de micro-organismes et pour le traitement d'infections du tractus respiratoire | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/11] | 20.09.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006015970 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,13-15,18 * page 1 * * page 4 * * page 6, line 4 - line 5 * * page 7, line 8 - line 16 * * page 19 - page 20 * * page 25, line 16 - line 35 * * page 28, line 30 - page 30 * * claim 19 *; | [X]US2005239778 (KONETZKI INGO [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10,13-15,18 * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0198] * * paragraph [0203] - paragraph [0220] * * paragraph [0254] * * paragraph [0433] * * paragraph [0436] * * paragraph [0438] * * paragraph [0467] * * paragraph [0486] *; | [X]WO02096423 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10,12 * page 46 - page 48 * * page 62, paragraph 227 * * page 63, paragraph 235 * * page 64, paragraph 252 * * page 66, paragraph 247 * * page 69, paragraph 259 * * page 72 - page 74 * * page 75, paragraph 286 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2005044186 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,7,13 * page 15 * * claims 1-6,17,23,25,36,58,60 *; | [X]US2005008578 (SCHMIDT FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1-4,13 * page 1, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 3, paragraph 38 *; | [X]WO03084519 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,13,14,18,19 * page 3 - page 4 * * page 5, line 4 - line 16 *; | [X]WO0232898 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,13-17 * page 1 * * page 49 - page 50 * * page 53, line 8 - line 21 * * page 56 * |