EP1763184 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND NOTIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/11] | Communication system, communication device and notification method | ||
[2017/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/46] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Kunihide, @c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Kazuyuki, @c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/46] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
Fujii, Kunihide, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Sakamoto, Kazuyuki, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/11] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06120460.8 | 11.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | JP20050263969 | 12.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005263969 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763184 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1763184 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763184 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04B5/00, // H04W8/06, G06F21/44 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/11] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/17] |
Former [2015/13] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSYSTEM, -VORRICHTUNG UND BENACHRICHTIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/25] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND NOTIFICATION METHOD | [2017/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE NOTIFICATION | [2017/25] |
Former [2007/11] | Kommunikationsystem, -vorrichtung und Benachrichtigungsverfahren | ||
Former [2007/11] | Communication system, communication device and notification method | ||
Former [2007/11] | Système de communication, dispositif de communication et procédé de notification | Examination procedure | 16.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1431904 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * NFC link establishment and relevant NFC protocol commands; paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0215] *; | [Y]WO2004110017 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * NFC link establishment; after initial detection and NFCID exchange, authentication and session key exchange; paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0111] *; | [Y]US2005172145 (KINDBERG TIMOTHY PAUL J G [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17* Method of using visible or audio indicators between an initiator and target device in order to indicate the establishment of a secure short range link; paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0033]; figure - *; | [Y] - ECMA, "ECMA-340, Near Field Communication - Interface and Protocol (NFCIP-1)", STANDARD ECMA-340, XX, XX, (20021231), pages 1 - 61, XP002290360 [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [11.2.2.3] - paragraph [11.2.2.4] * * NFC protocol and link establishment; paragraph [12.4] - paragraph [12.6] * | by applicant | JP2004215255 |