EP1777260 - Rubber composition and tire comprising thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dettmer, Dr. Fabian Bültenweg 5 38106, Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Soehnen, Dr. Dietmar Rothebreite 22 31867, Lauenau / DE | 03 /
Struebel, Dr. Christian Berkemannweg 6 30559, Hannover / DE | 04 /
Wagemann, Dr. Jürgen Ringstrasse 14 b 31162, Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | 05 /
Artal-Lahoz, Dr. Carmen Sebastián Recasens 26, 1-C 40007, Sevilla / ES | 06 /
Weinreich, Dr. Hajo Eichstrasse 7 31840, Hessisch Oldendorf / DE | [2007/17] | Application number, filing date | 06120611.6 | 14.09.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | DE20051050764 | 22.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050764 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777260 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777260 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K5/098 (EP);
C08K5/103 (EP);
C08L7/00 (EP);
C08L9/00 (EP);
C08L9/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/098, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/103, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08L2666/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Kautschukmischung und Reifen | [2007/17] | English: | Rubber composition and tire comprising thereof | [2007/17] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc pour pneumatiques | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | DK | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | FI | 22.04.2009 | IE | 22.04.2009 | IT | 22.04.2009 | LT | 22.04.2009 | LV | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | PL | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | ES | 02.08.2009 | IS | 22.08.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | AT | 14.09.2009 | LU | 14.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 22.04.2009 | |
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | FI | 22.04.2009 | |
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19834802 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1* claim - * |