EP1764884 - Crimping press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komax Holding AG Industriestrasse 6 6036 Dierikon / CH | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imgrüt, Peter / Neuhausweg 8 6340, Baar / CH | 02 /
Speck, Marc / Altstadt 40 6300, Zug / CH | [2013/14] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
Imgrüt, Peter Neuhausweg 8 6340, Baar / CH | ||
02 /
Speck, Marc Altstadt 40 6300, Zug / CH | Representative(s) | Blöchle, Hans, et al Inventio AG, Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2010/17] |
Former [2007/12] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / NW / CH | Application number, filing date | 06120624.9 | 14.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | EP20050108631 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05108631 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764884 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764884 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/055 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H01R43/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/48] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Crimppresse | [2007/12] | English: | Crimping press | [2007/12] | French: | Presse de sertissage | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.09.2013 | [2014/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1394908 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 1-6,9 * paragraph [0066]; figures 16a,16b * * paragraph [0101]; figures 19a,19b * [A] 7,8; | [Y]US4025999 (WOLYN JOSEPH, et al) [Y] 1-6,9 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 37; figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR2782578 (SIERMA INGENIERIE SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 27; figure 5 * | by applicant | EP1029387 | EP1394908 | US4025999 |