EP1779956 - Soldering device with a gas distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2008/13] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
For all designated states Messer Austria GmbH Am Kanal 2 2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatz, Gottfried Prossyweg 320 8461 Ehrenhausen / AT | 02 /
Tauchmann, Jens Angermunder Str. 34 47269 Duisburg / DE | [2007/18] | Application number, filing date | 06120687.6 | 14.09.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | DE20051052076 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005052076 | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779956 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/06, B23K1/08, // B23K101/42 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B23K3/0653 (EP);
B23K1/085 (EP);
B23K2101/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Lötvorrichtung mit einer Gasverteilung | [2007/18] | English: | Soldering device with a gas distribution system | [2007/18] | French: | Appareil de brasage avec un système de distribution de gaz | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 12.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19749187 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9924209 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4136806 (HOHNERLEIN ERNST [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0854001 (NIPPON DENNETSU KEIKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003205386 (MATSUBARA YOSHIMASA) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9420253 (ELECTROVERT LTD [CA]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH08130365 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0629655 (NIPPON DENNETSU KEIKI KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |