EP1798116 - Foldable rollover protection system for a convertible vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISE Automotive GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states ISE Innomotive Systems Europe GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beki, Gürkan Broicherweg 15 51766 Engelskirchen / DE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06120861.7 | 19.09.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | DE20051059910 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005059910 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1798116 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1798116 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1798116 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/13 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
B60R21/13 (EP,US);
B60R2021/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [2008/11] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überrollschutzsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge mit einem faltbaren Überrollbügel | [2007/25] | English: | Foldable rollover protection system for a convertible vehicle | [2007/25] | French: | Système d'arceau pliant de sécurité pour voiture cabriolet | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 05.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO0055015 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 1, line 30 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 28 - page 6, line 11; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE10143934 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0026]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9102669 (TEVES GMBH CO OHG ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 9 - page 9, line 8; figure -; claim - *; | [A] - "ADVERTISEMENT", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS. WARRENDALE, US, (19901201), vol. 98, no. 12, ISSN 0098-2571, pages 55 - 56,59,60,, XP000204655 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0233777 | DE19604423 | DE60001224T | DE10040642 | DE3925513 | DE3732562 | DE10143934 |