EP1768215 - Plasma Display Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Chul-Hong c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jung, Jin-Keun c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06121218.9 | 25.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | KR20050090000 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050090000 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1768215 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1768215 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/08, H01R12/16, H05K3/36 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H05K3/323 (EP,KR,US);
H01R12/62 (EP,KR,US);
H01R4/04 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/305 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/361 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2211/46 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU, NL [2010/26] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigegerät | [2007/13] | English: | Plasma Display Device | [2007/13] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage plasma | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 03.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2002151548 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9 * abstract * * and corresponding description, in particular ... * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0019] , [0033] , [0034] , [0043] , [0046] , [0052] * * - " - * [Y] 8,11-13; | [XY]JP2003195778 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0045] * * - " - * [Y] 8; | [XY]US2005110406 (JEONG YOUNG-CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0028] - [0047] - [0058]; figures 1-3 * * - " - * [Y] 8,11-13; | [XY]JPH03107888 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-4,9,10,14-16 * abstract * * - " - * [Y] 8,11-13; | [XY]US2002024302 (WU JIUN-HAN [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0008] - [0018] - [0020]; figures 3-6 * [Y] 8; | [XY]WO2004064143 (LG CABLE LTD [KR], et al) [X] 10,14-16 * pages 1-4,6-10; figures 3-6 * * - " - * [Y] 8,11-13; | [XY]JPH04366630 (SHARP KK) [X] 10,14-16 * abstract * * - " - * [Y] 8,11-13 |